MacDonald, Shavaun Irene (CPSO#: 81975)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Medical Records Department St Michael's Hospital 30 Bond Street Toronto, ON M5B 1W8
Date Received: 23 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Emergency Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist
Critical Care Medicine Effective: 31 Dec 2010 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 18 Oct 2004 to 14 Nov 2004
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Oct 2010 to 10 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 11 Nov 2010 to 19 Nov 2010
Elective Trainee - Critical Care Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Oct 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 14 Nov 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Oct 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Nov 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2012
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014