MacDonald, Steven James Michael (CPSO#: 60830)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Mar 1991

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
University Campus
London Health Sciences Centre
339 Windermere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3689
Fax: (519) 663-3096
Electoral District: 02

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 09 Nov 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JAMES MICHAEL MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1989 to 14 Jun 1990
Other - Rotating Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 1991