MacDougall, Keith William (CPSO#: 78100)

Current Status: Active Member as of 09 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC University Hospital
Division of Clinical Neurosciences
339 Winderemere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone: (519) 663-3628
Fax: (519) 663-3199
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Keith MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 8 2018


Corporation Name: Keith W. MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 20 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. MacDougall ( CPSO# 78100 )

Business Address:
LHSC - University Hospital
Division of Clinical Neurosciences
339 Winderemere Road
London ON  N6A 5A5
Phone Number: (519) 663-3628

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurosurgery Effective: 30 Jun 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEITH WILLIAM MACDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 2009