MacDougall, Peter Charles (CPSO#: 66636)

Current Status: Active Member as of 17 Aug 2016

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2016

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain
Medicine
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4203
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peter MacDougall Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 07 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. P. MacDougall ( CPSO# 66636 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Anesthesia and Pain Medicine
B311 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER CHARLES MACDOUGALL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDOUGALL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Sep 1995 to 14 Nov 1995
Resident 3 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 26 Mar 1996 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 25 Mar 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jul 2004
Elective Trainee - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2005 to 31 Aug 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1993
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Jun 1995
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2002
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jul 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2016