MacDougall, Robert James (CPSO#: 63128)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 31 Aug 2001

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Aug 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Sep 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 08 May 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2000
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 31 Mar 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Jun 2001
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 31 Oct 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2001