MacEachern, Janet Alayne (CPSO#: 69211)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Nov 1999

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Regional Cancer Center
835 King Street
P O Box 9056
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 5715
Fax: (519) 749-4378
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J. MacEachern Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacEachern ( CPSO# 69211 )

Business Address:
Grand River Regional Cancer Centre
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Sep 1999 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 30 Sep 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JANET ALAYNE MACEACHERN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACEACHERN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Sep 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1998 to 30 Sep 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Sep 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Oct 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Nov 1999