MacEachern, Michael Hugh (CPSO#: 53109)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2014

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Liege, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: P O Box 849 Moncton, NB E1C 8N6
Date Received: 26 May 2014

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 18 Nov 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Mar 1987
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1987
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 1990
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2014