MacEwen, Melissa Dawn (CPSO#: 86342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Jessome, Melissa Dawn (used until: 27 Jun 2007 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Beamsville Medical Centre
Family Health Team
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone: (905) 563-5315
Fax: (905) 563-0933
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Melissa D. MacEwen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacEwen ( CPSO# 86342 )

Business Address:
169 Main Street East
Grimsby ON  L3M 1P3
Phone Number: (905) 945-2253

Business Address:
Beamsville Medical Centre
Family Health Team
4279 Hixon Street
Beamsville ON  L0R 1B0
Phone Number: (905) 563-5315

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Lincoln Memorial Hospital Grimsby

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 25 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MELISSA DAWN MACEWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACEWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2009