MacEwen, Peter Clarke (CPSO#: 29118)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1973

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: The Ottawa Hospital Department of Anesthesiology 1053 Carling Avenue Ottawa, ON K1Y 4E9
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 15 Nov 1977 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 1973
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jun 1977
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017