Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

MacFadyen, John Campbell (CPSO#: 58155)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1987

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
216 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone: (705) 325-1120
Fax: (705) 325-1185
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: J.C. MacFadyen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 17 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macfadyen ( CPSO# 58155 )

Business Address:
216 Colborne Street West
Orillia ON  L3V 2Z6
Phone Number: (705) 325-1120

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 05 Jun 1991 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN CAMPBELL MACFADYEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACFADYEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1987 to 14 Jun 1988
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 4 - Internal Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1987
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 1988