MacGibbon, Sandra Lois (CPSO#: 59357)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 29 Jun 2009

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Jun 2009

Summary

Former Name: Alward, Sandra Lois (used until: 18 Aug 1997 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 12 Jun 1990 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jul 1989
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 29 Jun 2009