MacGregor, Katherine Elizabeth Crosby (CPSO#: 70146)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Nov 1998

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Nov 1998

Summary

Former Name: Crosby, Katherine Elizabeth (used until: 08 Dec 1996 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
209 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 0M2
Phone: (905) 845-8771
Fax: 905-845-8379
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 08 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. K. MacGregor ( CPSO# 70146 )
Dr. T. MacGregor ( CPSO# 70554 )

Business Address:
502 - 345 Lakeshore Road East
Oakville ON  L6J 1J5
Phone Number: (905) 338-0762

Business Address:
30 Derry Road East
Milton ON  L9T 2X5
Phone Number: (905) 878-2383

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
100 Queensway Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Phone Number: (905) 848-7100

Business Address:
Suite 202
209 Oak Park Boulevard
Oakville ON  L6H 0M2
Phone Number: (905) 845-8771

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Oakville Trafalgar Memorial Hospital Oakville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 04 Jun 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE ELIZABETH CROSBY MACGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Nov 1998