MacGregor, Susan Lynne (CPSO#: 55347)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1985

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Nov 1989

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McMaster University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
TOH Riverside Campus- Rehab Dept
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9
Phone: 613-738-8400 Ext. 82357
Fax: (613) 738-8431
Electoral District: 07
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

MedSport Ottawa
300-320 March Rd
Ottawa ON  K2K 2E3
Canada
Phone: (613) 763-1510
Fax: (613) 270-0982
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. L. MacGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 16 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacGregor ( CPSO# 55347 )

Business Address:
1967 Riverside Drive
Physio Department
Ottawa ON  K1H 8M2
Phone Number: (613) 438-8400

Business Address:
300 - 320 March Road
Kanata ON  K2K 2E3
Phone Number: (613) 763-1510

Business Address:
300 - 100 Marie Curie
Ottawa ON  K2K 2E3
Phone Number: (613) 564-3950

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 07 Sep 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN LYNNE MACGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1985 to 30 Jun 1986
Other - Comprehensive Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1985
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 1989