MacGregor, William Gordon (CPSO#: 69621)

Current Status: Active Member as of 31 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone: (807) 684-6100
Electoral District: 09
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lansdell & Jacobson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 31 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Chang ( CPSO# 88444 )
Dr. K. Lansdell ( CPSO# 93305 )
Dr. M. Heringer ( CPSO# 98149 )
Dr. R. Coulombe ( CPSO# 85597 )
Dr. D. Wood ( CPSO# 69249 )
Dr. M. Powlowski ( CPSO# 57083 )
Dr. W. Neilipovitz ( CPSO# 61636 )
Dr. D. Mutrie ( CPSO# 30037 )
Dr. P. Martel ( CPSO# 75620 )
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )
Dr. G. Francis ( CPSO# 71385 )
Dr. P. Dupuis ( CPSO# 60169 )
Dr. Y. Chow ( CPSO# 66746 )
Dr. B. Jacobson ( CPSO# 83213 )
Dr. S. Green ( CPSO# 86498 )
Dr. J. VanderBurgh ( CPSO# 88595 )
Dr. F. Sarrazin ( CPSO# 89299 )
Dr. J. Smith ( CPSO# 91016 )
Dr. M. Twiddy ( CPSO# 95507 )
Dr. A. Exley ( CPSO# 95194 )
Dr. E. Poliakova ( CPSO# 95831 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4
Phone Number: (807) 684-6000


Corporation Name: W.G. MacGregor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. W. MacGregor ( CPSO# 69621 )

Business Address:
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay ON  P7B 6V4

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 26 Jun 1995 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Dec 1998 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WILLIAM GORDON MACGREGOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACGREGOR is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Aug 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 1995