MacIntosh, Jocelyn Marie (CPSO#: 54764)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jan 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
190 Memorial Avenue
Suite D
Orillia ON  L3V 5X6
Phone: (705) 327-5776
Electoral District: 05

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 12 Nov 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOCELYN MARIE MACINTOSH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACINTOSH is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jul 1984
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 16 Aug 1990
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 1992