MacIsaac, Michael Gerard (CPSO#: 70549)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 09 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
stratford general hospital
dept of emergency medicine
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone: (519) 272-8210 Ext. 2455
Electoral District: 02
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

730 st Andrew street
Stratford ON  N5A 1A3
Canada
Phone: (519) 271-2180
County: County of Perth
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Masella MacIsaac Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 10 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacIsaac ( CPSO# 70549 )
Dr. J. Masella ( CPSO# 71491 )

Business Address:
St. Thomas Elgin General Hospital
189 Elm Street
St Thomas ON  N5R 5C4
Phone Number: (519) 631-2030

Business Address:
Stratford General Hospital
Dept of Emergency Medicine
46 General Hospital Drive
Stratford ON  N5A 2Y6
Phone Number: (519) 272-8210

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Stratford General Hospital Stratford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 05 Dec 1997 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL GERARD MACISAAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACISAAC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 09 Jul 1996