MacKay, Rebecca Ellyn (CPSO#: 88083)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 29 Feb 2012

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 29 Feb 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Saskatchewan, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2010 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 21 Oct 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 19 Feb 2008 to 07 Mar 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2008 to 25 Jul 2008
Elective Trainee - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Sep 2011 to 29 Feb 2012
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Feb 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 07 Mar 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Jul 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 29 Feb 2012