MacKay, Ronald Fraser (CPSO#: 32159)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Sep 1979

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 Jan 1981

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone: (905) 688-1827
Fax: (905) 688-7283
Electoral District: 04
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

840 Queenston Road
Unit 826
Stoney Creek
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Canada
Phone: (905) 664-1304
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

Segue Clinic
816 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3B 3Y7
Canada
Phone: (905) 788-3173
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

97 Charlotte St
Port Colborne ON  L3K 3E1
Canada
Phone: (905) 834-7271
Fax: (905) 834-1001
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

554 Main St. E
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Canada
Phone: (905) 533-1333
Fax: (905) 522-0444
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04

4632 Victoria Ave
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 4B7
Canada
Phone: 905 358 7720
Fax: 905 522 0444
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04

8 Clairmount St., Unit 1
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1
Canada
Phone: 289 479 5703
Fax: 905 680 9898
County: Regional Municipality of Niagara
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacKay Derksen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 25 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827


Corporation Name: Derksen And Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 06 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )

Business Address:
1 - 8 Clairmont Street
Thorold ON  L2V 1R1

Business Address:
816 East Main Street
Welland ON  L3C 3Y7
Phone Number: (905) 788-3614

Business Address:
Segue Clinic Hamilton
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8M 1J3
Phone Number: (905) 522-1333

Business Address:
Segue Clinic Port Colborne
97 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 3E1
Phone Number: (905) 834-7272

Business Address:
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827

Business Address:
840 Queenston Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 644-1358


Corporation Name: R.F. MacKay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 20 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827

Business Address:
101-626 Main Street East
Welland ON  L3B 3Y2
Phone Number: (905) 788-3173

Business Address:
554 Main Street East
Hamilton ON  L8G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 522-0444

Business Address:
97 Charlotte Street
Port Colborne ON  L3K 3E2
Phone Number: (905) 823-7272

Business Address:
Suite 826
840 Queenston Road
Stoney Creek ON  L8G 4A8
Phone Number: (905) 664-1304


Corporation Name: Brent Derksen Fraser Mackay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 29 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Mackay ( CPSO# 32159 )
Dr. B. Derksen ( CPSO# 65549 )

Business Address:
1 - 4632 Victoria Avenue
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 4B7
Phone Number: (905) 358-7720

Business Address:
Segue Clinic
61 James Street
St Catharines ON  L2R 5B9
Phone Number: (905) 688-1827

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hotel-Dieu-Shaver Health and Rehabilitation Centre St Catharines

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 May 2013 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RONALD FRASER MACKAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKAY is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 1979
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 1981