MacKenzie, Mary Jean Frances (CPSO#: 72071)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone: (519) 685-8640
Fax: (519) 685-8624
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mary Jean F. MacKenzie Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 12 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. M. MacKenzie ( CPSO# 72071 )

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Program
Department of Medical Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Oncology Effective: 12 Sep 2002 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JEAN FRANCES MACKENZIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKENZIE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 05 Feb 1998 to 04 Mar 1998
Elective Trainee - Infectious Diseases

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Oncology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Feb 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Mar 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2001