MacKinnon, Judith Anne Wittman (CPSO#: 72353)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Sep 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Sep 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1475 Upper Ottawa Street
Hamilton ON  L8W 3J6
Phone: (905) 575-1300
Fax: (905) 575-1539
Electoral District: 04

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 29 Aug 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JUDITH ANNE WITTMAN MACKINNON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACKINNON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 31 Aug 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2001
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2001