MacKinnon, Martin Glen (CPSO#: 75174)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jul 2005

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jul 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Nephrology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Nephrology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2004
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jul 2005