MacLachlan, Donna Jayne (CPSO#: 68287)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Mar 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Mar 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Youthdale Treatment Centre
227 Victoria Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1T8
Phone: (416) 363-3751 Ext. 2091
Fax: (416) 363-7945
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 28 Feb 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA JAYNE MACLACHLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLACHLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1996 to 31 Dec 1996
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1997 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1997 to 31 Dec 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 31 Dec 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1999 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 22 Feb 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 22 Feb 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2000