MacLean, Gillian Rowe (CPSO#: 89573)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2017

Summary

Former Name: Rowe, Gillian MacLean (used until: 30 Sep 2014 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Children's Hospital of
Eastern Ontario
Department of Paediatrics
401 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Phone: (613) 737-7600
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 21 Apr 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GILLIAN ROWE MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 14 Mar 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 15 Mar 2013 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 28 Feb 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Mar 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 21 Apr 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Apr 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 21 Apr 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 22 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 10 Oct 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Neonatal-Perinatal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2017