MacLean, Jonathan Alan (CPSO#: 81550)

Current Status: Active Member as of 26 Aug 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Aug 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Otolaryngology
1200 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 75246
Fax: (905) 521-9992
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jonathan MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Dec 27 2013


Corporation Name: Jonathan MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 14 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacLean ( CPSO# 81550 )

Business Address:
Room 3UN
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Hamilton Health Sciences
Department of Otolaryngology
1200 Main Street West
Room 4E
Hamilton ON  L8N 3Z5
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JONATHAN ALAN MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 1 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 2 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 3 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 4 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 5 - Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2004
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Aug 2010