MacLean, Mary Janet (CPSO#: 64110)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
524 Clarence Street
Box 880
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone: (613) 774-3452
Fax: (613) 774-4321
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Janet MacLean Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 07 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Maclean ( CPSO# 64110 )

Business Address:
524 Clarence Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-3452

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kemptville District Hospital Kemptville
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 14 Nov 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARY JANET MACLEAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Other - Comprehensive Internship

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1993