MacLellan, Steven James (CPSO#: 84518)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Sep 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
MIS Group
960 Lawrence Ave West
Suite 504
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone: (416) 782-2616
Fax: (416) 782-5899
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Steven MacLellan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 17 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. S. MacLellan ( CPSO# 84518 )

Business Address:
MIS Group
Suite 504
960 Lawrence Avenue West
Toronto ON  M6A 3B5
Phone Number: (416) 782-2616

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Humber River Hospital,Wilson Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. STEVEN JAMES MACLELLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLELLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Urology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Urology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Sep 2012