MacLeod, Hugh Murray (CPSO#: 67786)

Current Status: Active Member as of 03 Jul 1996

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jul 1996

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of British Columbia, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone: (519) 749-4300 Ext. 2631
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Hugh Murray MacLeod Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 22 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. H. Macleod ( CPSO# 67786 )

Business Address:
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener ON  N2G 1G3
Phone Number: (519) 749-4300

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Freeport Site Kitchener
Grand River Hospital Corporation,Kitchener Waterloo Site Kitchener
Hamilton Health Sciences,Juravinski Hospital and Cancer Centre Hamilton
Kirkland and District Hospital Kirkland Lake
Niagara Health System Port Colborne General Site Port Colborne
Niagara Health System,Douglas Memorial Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System,St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
St Mary's General Hospital,Kitchener Kitchener
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 10 Jun 1996 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. HUGH MURRAY MACLEOD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACLEOD is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 1996