MacLeod, Susan Elizabeth (CPSO#: 74822)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 03 Jun 2010

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 03 Jun 2010

Summary

Former Name: Shallow, Susan Elizabeth (used until: 13 Sep 2001 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Memorial University of Newfoundland, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2002
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jun 2010