MacMillan, Brent Michael (CPSO#: 63846)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 31 Mar 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1991

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ross Memorial Hospital
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone: (705) 324-6111
Fax: (705) 328-6237
Electoral District: 06
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Haliburton Highlands Health Service
6 McPherson Street
Minden ON  K0M 2K0
Canada
Phone: (705) 286-2140
County: County of Haliburton
Electoral District: 06

Central East Correctional Centre
541 Hwy # 36
Lindsay ON  K9V 4S6
Canada
Phone: (705) 328-6000
County: County of Victoria
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Brent M. MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 31 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Macmillan ( CPSO# 63846 )

Business Address:
10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay ON  K9V 4M8
Phone Number: (705) 324-6111

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Haliburton Highlands Health Services,Minden Hospital Site Minden
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRENT MICHAEL MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 1993