MacMillan, Joseph Barry (CPSO#: 60873)

Current Status: Active Member as of 12 Jun 1989

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Aug 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1989

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 646-6247
Fax: (519) 646-6039
Electoral District: 02
Find more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

St Joseph's Health Centre
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4V2
Canada
County: County of Middlesex
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. J. Barry MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 25 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macmillan ( CPSO# 60873 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road
Room B2-409
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 646-6247

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 1994 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOSEPH BARRY MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1989 to 11 Jun 1990
Other - Comprehensive Internship

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Clinical Fellow - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1989
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Aug 1993