MacMillan, Leslie Garth (CPSO#: 51078)

Current Status: Expired: Emeritus status as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1978

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Medical Records Location

Address: Princess Margaret Hospital Department of Health Records 610 University Avenue Toronto, ON M5G 2M9
Date Received: 21 Apr 2017

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 08 Jun 1982 RCPSC Specialist
Medical Microbiology Effective: 13 Dec 1984 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 12 Jun 1978 to 18 Jun 1979
Other - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1979 to 30 Jun 1980
Resident 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1980 to 30 Jun 1981
Resident 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1981 to 30 Jun 1982
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1982 to 30 Jun 1983
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1984 to 30 Jun 1985
Resident 4 - Medical Microbiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 12 Jun 1978
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017