MacMillan, Thomas Evan (CPSO#: 90690)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8 - 415
399 Bathurst St
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 340-3155
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Thomas MacMillan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Richardson ( CPSO# 29524 )
Dr. T. MacMillan ( CPSO# 90690 )

Business Address:
UHN Toronto Western Hospital
E W 8- 415
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 340-3155

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
Timmins and District Hospital Timmins
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. THOMAS EVAN MACMILLAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACMILLAN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2013