MacNaughton, Donald Michael (CPSO#: 52857)

Current Status: Active Member as of 21 Dec 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Dec 1988

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
144 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone: (613) 544-3400 Ext. 3620
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacNaughton Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 06 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Macnaughton ( CPSO# 52857 )

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
144 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery Effective: 09 Sep 1988 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONALD MICHAEL MACNAUGHTON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNAUGHTON is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1983
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1984
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Dec 1988