MacNay, Ramsay Gordon (CPSO#: 67878)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1994

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 1998

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 604
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone: (905) 523-1209
Fax: (905) 523-7526
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ramsay MacNay Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Busche ( CPSO# 88593 )
Dr. R. Macnay ( CPSO# 67878 )

Business Address:
Suite 604
25 Charlton Avenue East
Hamilton ON  L8N 1Y2
Phone Number: (905) 523-1209

Business Address:
128 Emerald Street South
Hamilton ON  L8N 2V5
Phone Number: (905) 526-7137

Business Address:
Brantford General Hospital
200 Terrace Hill Street
Brantford ON  N3R 1G9
Phone Number: (519) 751-5544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 1998 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RAMSAY GORDON MACNAY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNAY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
PostGrad Yr 1 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 2 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 3 - Pediatrics

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 4 - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1994
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1998