MacNeil, John Roderick Grant (CPSO#: 97794)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone: 7056584544
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: JRG MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 03 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Macneil ( CPSO# 97794 )

Business Address:
Weeneebayko General Hospital
Box 664
19 Hospital Drive
Moose Factory ON  P0L 1W0
Phone Number: (705) 658-4544

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority,Moose Factory Site Moose Factory
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Attawapiskat Site Attawapiskat
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Fort Albany Site Fort Albany
Weeneebayko Health Ahtuskaywin Moosonee Site Moosonee

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOHN RODERICK GRANT MACNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNEIL is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2014