MacNeil, Robert Bernard (CPSO#: 59959)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1988

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 12 May 1992

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 1986

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
B312-1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 761-4169
Fax: (613) 761-5209
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: MacNeil Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 29 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Macneil ( CPSO# 59959 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
B312 - 1053 Carling Avenue
Mail Code 249C
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 761-4169

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 03 Jun 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT BERNARD MACNEIL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNEIL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 4 - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 May 1992