MacNeill, Susan Jane (CPSO#: 73423)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jan 2005

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Jan 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Ottawa Anxiety and Trauma Clinic
Billings Bridge Plaza, Suite 202
2277 Riverside Dr.
Ottawa ON  K1H 7X6
Phone: (613) 737-1194
Fax: (613) 737-5884
Electoral District: 07

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 26 Oct 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN JANE MACNEILL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACNEILL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 02 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 02 Dec 2004
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2005