MacPhee, Ian James (CPSO#: 79149)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 21 Jun 2005

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Dalhousie University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 202
175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 0E9
Phone: (519) 766-9559
Fax: (519) 766-1709
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ian MacPhee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. I. MacPhee ( CPSO# 79149 )

Business Address:
202 - 175 Chancellors Way
Guelph ON  N1G 5K1
Phone Number: (519) 766-9559


Corporation Name: I. MacPhee Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 17 2011

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Guelph General Hospital Guelph
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 16 Jun 2005 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. IAN JAMES MACPHEE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACPHEE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 2005