MacPherson, Colin John (CPSO#: 77716)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Quinte Health Care
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone: (613) 969-7400 Ext. 2232
Fax: (613) 969-8448
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. C. MacPherson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 10 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. C. MacPherson ( CPSO# 77716 )

Business Address:
ACCT
289 Pinnacle Street
Suite 201
Belleville ON  K8N 3B3
Phone Number: (613) 962-0259

Business Address:
145 Station Stsreet
Belleville ON  K8N 2S9
Phone Number: (613) 771-1910

Business Address:
Quinte Health Centre
265 Dundas Street East
Belleville ON  K8N 5A9
Phone Number: (613) 969-7400

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. COLIN JOHN MACPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACPHERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007