MacPherson, Jeffrey David (CPSO#: 87795)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Dec 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Dec 2009

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Dublin Trinity College, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone: (905) 372-6811
Fax: (905) 372-4243
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jeffrey MacPherson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 21 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. MacPherson ( CPSO# 87795 )

Business Address:
1000 DePalma Drive
Cobourg ON  K9A 5W6
Phone Number: (905) 372-6811

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 20 Oct 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY DAVID MACPHERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACPHERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2007 to 07 Jan 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 08 Jan 2008 to 22 Oct 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 23 Oct 2008 to 19 Oct 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Jan 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 19 Oct 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Dec 2009