MacQueen, Glenda Marlene (CPSO#: 65175)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1992

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Jul 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
#20, 70 Chapman Court
London ON  N4G 4Z4
Phone: (403) 238-5362
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. G.M. MacQueen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 17 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Macqueen ( CPSO# 65175 )

Business Address:
7007-14 Street Southwest
Calgary AB  T2P 1P6
Phone Number: (403) 605-8972

Business Address:
20 Conrad Place
Grimsby ON  L3M 5S5
Phone Number: (403) 238-5362

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Alberta

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 1997 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. GLENDA MARLENE MACQUEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACQUEEN is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1992
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1993