MacRae, Judith Diane (CPSO#: 70277)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 01 May 2000

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 May 2000

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of Ottawa, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 23 Sep 1997 to 04 May 1998
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 05 May 1998 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 25 Jan 2000 to 01 May 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1996
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1997
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1998
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2000
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 01 May 2000