MacRae, Robert Malcolm (CPSO#: 68996)

Current Status: Active Member as of 23 May 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 May 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital Cancer Centre
PO Box 903
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 737-7700 Ext. 70206
Fax: (613) 247-3511
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Robert Malcolm MacRae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 24 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. R. MacRae ( CPSO# 68996 )

Business Address:
Ottawa Hospital Regional Cancer Centre
PO Box 903
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 737-7700

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ROBERT MALCOLM MACRAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACRAE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1995 to 30 Jun 1996
Resident 1 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1996 to 30 Jun 1997
Resident 2 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
PostGrad Yr 3 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 4 - Radiation Oncology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 5 - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1995
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2000
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 May 2001