MacSween, Moira Anne (CPSO#: 76053)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Apr 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Chigamik Community Health Centre
845 King Street
Midland, Ontario
L4R 0B7
Midland ON  L4R 0B7
Phone: (705) 527-4154
Fax: (705) 526-2870
Electoral District: 05

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MOIRA ANNE MACSWEEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACSWEEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2004