Macaisa, Perlita Jao (CPSO#: 85834)

Current Status: Expired: Terms and conditions as of 31 Dec 2008

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 31 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:University of The East Philippines, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2007 to 07 Mar 2007
PEAP - Resident - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 08 Mar 2007 to 31 Dec 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2008