Macarthur Sr., William John Campbell (CPSO#: 10910)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 1993

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McGill University, 1938

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 01 Jan 1973 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Oct 1939
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 03 Jan 1978
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 1979
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 1993