Find A Doctor will be undergoing maintenance between 6:00pm on Friday, December 15, 2017 and 12:00 noon on Saturday, December 16, 2017. You may experience intermittent service interruptions during this time. We apologize for the inconvenience.

×Close

Macaulay, Robert James Blair (CPSO#: 59707)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 28 Aug 1995

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 28 Aug 1995

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neuropathology Effective: 30 Jun 1993 RCPSC Specialist

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Neuropathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 1988
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 28 Aug 1995