Macbeath, Lyn Susan (CPSO#: 56319)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 19 Jul 1989

CPSO Registration Class: None as of

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Unknown

Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Education:Dalhousie University, 1981

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 10 Jun 1986 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Oct 1985
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Nov 1985
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 1986
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Mar 1986
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 1988
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 19 Jul 1989