Macdonald, Brian Kenneth (CPSO#: 52336)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jun 1982

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Aug 1983

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
715A Arlington Park Place
Kingston ON  K7M 7E4
Phone: (613) 384-8222
Fax: (613) 384-8221
Electoral District: 06

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 12 Jun 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRIAN KENNETH MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 15 Jun 1982 to 15 Jun 1983
Other - Rotating Internship

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1983 to 30 Jun 1984
Resident 1 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Psychiatry

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jun 1982
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Aug 1983