Macdonald, Catherine Ellen (CPSO#: 54038)

Current Status: Active Member as of 11 Jun 1984

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 25 Jun 1985

Summary

Former Name: Best, Catherine Ellen (used until: 06 Jun 1984 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1984

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hospital For Sick Children
Department Of Diagnostic Imaging
555 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X8
Phone: 416-813-6067
Fax: 416-813-7644
Electoral District: 10

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 May 1990 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CATHERINE ELLEN MACDONALD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MACDONALD is educated and experienced.

Post Graduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of post-graduate training.

University of Toronto, 11 Jun 1984 to 17 Jun 1985
Other - Rotating Internship

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1986 to 30 Jun 1987
Resident 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1987 to 30 Jun 1988
Resident 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Resident 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1989 to 30 Jun 1990
Resident 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 1984
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Jun 1985